Security National Insurance Company v. Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Security National Insurance Company
Defendant: Continental Trust Corporation Limited As Trustee of the Ocean Reef Club, Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A., Continental Trust Corporation Limited, Hycroft Limited, Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz and Quintay Limited
Case Number: 1:2018cv23656
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Security National Insurance Company(a Delaware corporation). (Leon, Jose)
November 5, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Security National Insurance Company(a Delaware corporation). (Leon, Jose)
November 5, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Michael Bradstreet on behalf of Continental Trust Corporation Limited, Continental Trust Corporation Limited As Trustee of the Ocean Reef Club, Hycroft Limited, Quintay Limited. Attorney Eric Michael Bradstreet added to party Continental Trust Corporation Limited (pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Bradstreet added to party Continental Trust Corporation Limited As Trustee of the Ocean Reef Club(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Bradstreet added to party Hycroft Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Bradstreet added to party Quintay Limited(pty:dft). (Bradstreet, Eric)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 11/6/2019 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 2/22/2019. Fact Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2019. Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2019. Mediation Deadline 7/19/2019. In Limine Motions due by 9/27/2019. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 29, 2018 Filing 28 REPORT REGARDING JOINT CONFERENCE by Security National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leon, Jose)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Security National Insurance Company by Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)(Mazer, Jason) Modified Text on 10/16/2018 (ls).
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 Amended NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Andrew Boyle on behalf of Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz (Boyle, Mark) Modified Text on 10/16/2018 (ls).
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Security National Insurance Company by Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz. (Smith, Ellen) Modified Text on 10/16/2018 (ls).
October 15, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen Germuska Smith on behalf of Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz. Attorney Ellen Germuska Smith added to party Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz(pty:dft). (Smith, Ellen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Security National Insurance Company. Quintay Limited waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Leon, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Security National Insurance Company. Hycroft Limited waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Leon, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Security National Insurance Company. Continental Trust Corporation Limited As Trustee of the Ocean Reef Club waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Leon, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Security National Insurance Company. Continental Trust Corporation Limited waiver sent on 9/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Leon, Jose)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/9/2018. (smz)
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz. (Boyle, Mark)
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Andrew Boyle on behalf of Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz. Attorney Mark Andrew Boyle added to party Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz(pty:dft). (Boyle, Mark)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel ("Defendant") has failed to set forth any reason, much less good cause, why its time to respond should be more than doubled. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/4/2018. (smz)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.. (Mazer, Jason)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Ryan Alhalel on behalf of Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.. Attorney Joshua Ryan Alhalel added to party Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.(pty:dft). (Alhalel, Joshua)
October 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Seth Mazer on behalf of Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.. Attorney Jason Seth Mazer added to party Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.(pty:dft). (Mazer, Jason)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Security National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, Redacted Exhibit B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Complaint) (Leon, Jose)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES: Counsel to Meet and File Joint Scheduling Report; Expedited Service; Referral of Case to Magistrate Judge; Notice of Joint Motions; Magistrate Judge Goodman's Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Security National Insurance Company. Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Leon, Jose)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Security National Insurance Company. Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Leon, Jose)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER requiring the filing of redacted exhibit. I previously issued an #4 Order granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Seal Portion of Record, which stated that Exhibit B to the #1 Complaint "contain[ed] sensitive and confidential financial information." Plaintiff must now file a new version of the same exhibit with all such information redacted. Plaintiff shall file the redacted version of the exhibit no later than September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/14/2018. (smz)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A., Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz. (ls)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Security National Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, filed by Security National Insurance Company (Leon, Jose)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Sealing [1-3] pursuant to #4 Order (nc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 9/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (smz)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Emergency MOTION To Seal Portion of Record re #1 Complaint, by Security National Insurance Company. (Leon, Jose)Text Modified on 9/11/2018 (cqs).
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and for Rescission against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10975620, filed by Security National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Leon, Jose) Modified by Sealing [1-3] pursuant to #4 Order on 9/11/2018 (nc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security National Insurance Company v. Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Trust Corporation Limited As Trustee of the Ocean Reef Club
Represented By: Eric Michael Bradstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siegfried, Rivera, Hyman, Lerner, De La Torre, Mars & Sobel, P.A.
Represented By: Joshua Ryan Alhalel
Represented By: Jason Seth Mazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Trust Corporation Limited
Represented By: Eric Michael Bradstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hycroft Limited
Represented By: Eric Michael Bradstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Scott Berlowitz
Represented By: Ellen Germuska Smith
Represented By: Mark Andrew Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintay Limited
Represented By: Eric Michael Bradstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security National Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Marissa De Leon
Represented By: Jose Ignacio Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?