Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation v. Abraham

Appellant: Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation
Appellee: Arkadi Abraham
Case Number: 1:2018cv23658
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 18 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Appellant's unopposed motion to supplement the record in this bankruptcy appeal. #17 . Appellant may file the previously omitted audio recording conventionally with the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
October 30, 2018 17 MOTION to Supplement Record on Appeal to #13 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court, by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation (Hechtman, Brandon) Modified to covert document into a motion on 11/5/2018 (jua).
October 26, 2018 16 Appellant's BRIEF by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation. (Hechtman, Brandon)
October 25, 2018 15 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/26/2018. (jc)
October 25, 2018 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/22/18 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-14 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2019. (dcn)
October 25, 2018 13 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's LIST of Designated Items, #3 Appellant's Statement of Issues, #4 Appellant's Designated Items, #5 Appellee's LIST of Designated Items, #6 Appellee's Statement of Issues, #7 Appellee's Designated Items)(dcn)
October 15, 2018 12 Featured Case Order Setting Oral Argument And Briefing Schedule In Bankruptcy Appeal( Appellant Brief due by 10/26/2018., Appellee Brief due by 11/26/2018., Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/10/2018.), ( Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 2/25/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
October 15, 2018 11 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Appellant's motion for extension of time to file initial brief in this bankruptcy appeal #8 . The Appellant's brief now due by October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
October 10, 2018 Case Reopened (jc)
October 10, 2018 10 Bankruptcy Order GRANTING Creditor, Coral & Stones Unlimited Corp.'s Motion to Reconsider Order Dismissing Appeal Signed by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge A.Jay Cristol on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (jc)
October 10, 2018 9 NOTICE by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation of Filing Order Vacating Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Order) (Read, Alexis)
October 8, 2018 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Initial Appellate Brief by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Read, Alexis)
September 19, 2018 7 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues, Closing Case. Signed by US Bankruptcy Court Judge A. Jay Cristol on 9/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (jc)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexis Sophia Read on behalf of Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation. Attorney Alexis Sophia Read added to party Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation(pty:a). (Read, Alexis)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P Dunn on behalf of Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation. Attorney Michael P Dunn added to party Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation(pty:a). (Dunn, Michael)
September 7, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
September 7, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
September 7, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
September 7, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-13746-AJC, filed by Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation v. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Coral & Stones Unlimited Corporation
Represented By: Brandon Jay Hechtman
Represented By: Alexis Sophia Read
Represented By: Michael P Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arkadi Abraham
Represented By: Christian Somodevilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?