Eslinger et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Derek Edward Eslinger and Tara Lynn Eslinger
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23672
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant Celebrity Cruises, Inc's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (Milewski, Caroline)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 MOTION TO DISMISS. Tara Lynn Eslinger terminated. (Celebrity Cruises, Inc. response due 10/30/2018.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (Milewski, Caroline)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruise Line, LTD. for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Milewski, Caroline)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger identifying Other Affiliate Richard D Fain, Other Affiliate Adam M Goldstein, Other Affiliate Royal Caribbean International, Other Affiliate Lisa Lutoff-Perlo, Other Affiliate Jason T Liberty, Other Affiliate Bradley H Stein, Other Affiliate Vagn Sorensen, Other Affiliate William Kimsey, Other Affiliate Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., a Liberian Corporation for Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger (Brock, Lindsey)
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Milewski, Caroline)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger. Replies due by 10/23/2018. (Brock, Lindsey)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs on behalf of Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Briggs, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2018 (Milewski, Caroline)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Leigh Milewski on behalf of Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Caroline Leigh Milewski added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Milewski, Caroline)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger re #4 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (Brock, Lindsey)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Brock, Lindsey)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ( -Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/19/2018, Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (asl)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (pes)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pes)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10977647, filed by Derek Edward Eslinger, Tara Lynn Eslinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Brock, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eslinger et al v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Edward Eslinger
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III.
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Lynn Eslinger
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III.
Represented By: Lindsay C. Tropnas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs
Represented By: Caroline Leigh Milewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?