Siebler v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Siebler
Defendant: Richard Sackler, Paulo Costa, Beverly Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Purdue Pharma, LP, Mark Timney, David Sackler, Ralph Snyderman, Kathe Sackler, Craig Landau, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Judy Lewent, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Johnathan Sackler and Cecil Pickett
Case Number: 1:2018cv23684
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46176, filed 10/25/2018. (bb)
October 23, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:18-cv-23684 electronically transferred out to Ohio Northern. (mc)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-60) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER this cause comes before the Court upon the conditional transfer order entered in MDL No. 2804, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation. The case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. All hearings are CANCELLED and pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP. (dj)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Carmen Siebler re #7 Order Reopening Case,, Terminate Motions, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons-Purdue Pharma, LP, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons-Purdue Pharma, Inc.) (Osborne, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #8 Amended Complaint. Document Replaced Due to Error. The original document has been replaced and has been attached to this notice. (mc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Carmen Siebler.(mc) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/21/2018) (mc).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reconsider Dismissal. The case is REOPENED. The amended Complaint DE 6-1 is deemed effective as of the date of this order. The Clerk SHALL separately docket the amended complaint (DE 6-1). Plaintiff SHALL file proposed summonses no later than Wednesday, September 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case by Carmen Siebler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Osborne, Joseph)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Dismissing Case without prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/19/2018 Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Carmen Siebler, ( Amended Complaint due by 9/13/2018.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (dj)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10978716, filed by Carmen Siebler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siebler v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulo Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Snyderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Lewent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Siebler
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?