Anderson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Betty Kay Anderson
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23699
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Joel Kaplan; Mediation Hearing set for 12/4/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended Complaint due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2018 re #14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 0 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Philip Dixon Parrish, James Madison Walker, Carlos Javier Chardon, Michael Dono. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ado)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Betty Kay Anderson (Notice of Filing Order Scheduling Mediation) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Walker, James)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion by Betty Kay Anderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pucci v. Carnival Corp.) (Parrish, Philip)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Betty Kay Anderson. Replies due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parrish, Philip)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two week period beginning 8/19/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 8/13/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Proposed order scheduling mediation, in Word format via email, due by 11/6/18; Mediation Deadline 4/29/2019. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Loveland, Samantha)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Betty Kay Anderson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, James)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Chardon, Carlos)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Carlos Javier Chardon added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "C")(Chardon, Carlos)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Loveland, Samantha)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Betty Kay Anderson (Walker, James)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Answer due 10/10/2018. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Betty Kay Anderson. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Samantha S Loveland added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveland, Samantha)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of interested parties by 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Betty Kay Anderson. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 9/12/2018, answer due 10/3/2018. (Walker, James)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Phillip Moure on behalf of Betty Kay Anderson. Attorney Charles Phillip Moure added to party Betty Kay Anderson(pty:pla). (Moure, Charles)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip Dixon Parrish on behalf of Betty Kay Anderson. Attorney Philip Dixon Parrish added to party Betty Kay Anderson(pty:pla). (Parrish, Philip)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (lbc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lbc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10981894, filed by Betty Kay Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Walker, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Kay Anderson
Represented By: James Madison Walker
Represented By: Charles Phillip Moure
Represented By: Philip Dixon Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha S Loveland
Represented By: Carlos Javier Chardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?