Velazquez v. U.S. Alliance Management Corp.
Plaintiff: Luis Velazquez
Defendant: U.S. Alliance Management Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv23776
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 7/22/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 7/16/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/11/2019.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 Defendant's RESPONSE to #6 Statement of Claim by U.S. Alliance Management Corp.. (Erickson, Robert)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Luis Velazquez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Feld, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by U.S. Alliance Management Corp.. (Erickson, Robert)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance by Luis Velazquez re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order of Requirements, (Feld, Daniel)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Mikel Erickson on behalf of U.S. Alliance Management Corp. (Erickson, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by U.S. Alliance Management Corp.. Attorney Robert Mikel Erickson added to party U.S. Alliance Management Corp.(pty:dft). (Erickson, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Statement of: Claim by Luis Velazquez (Mamane, Isaac)
September 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Luis Velazquez. U.S. Alliance Management Corp. served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Feld, Daniel)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive and Discovery Matters., Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in FLSA case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (lh)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Alliance Management Corp.. (lh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10993574, filed by Luis Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mamane, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velazquez v. U.S. Alliance Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Velazquez
Represented By: Isaac Jackie Mamane
Represented By: Daniel T. Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Alliance Management Corp.
Represented By: Robert Mikel Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?