JXB 84 LLC v. Deutsche Bank National Trust

Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Appellant: JXB 84 LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv23815
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 11 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal and for Enlargement of Time for Initial Brief. The parties may supplement the record on appeal with the transcript from the July 25, 2018 hearing. Appellant's brief shall be filed on or before December 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 1, 2018 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal and for Enlargement of Time for Initial Brief ( Responses due by 11/15/2018), MOTION to Supplement Record on Appeal by JXB 84 LLC. (Aresty, Joel)
October 12, 2018 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 6/25/18 before Judge A. Jay Cristol, 1-38 pages, Court Reporter: Ouellette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2018. (dcn)
October 12, 2018 8 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 11/13/2018. (jc)
October 12, 2018 7 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by JXB 84 LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation and Statement of Issues, #3 Appellant's Designated Items ECF #1-#83, #4 Appellee's Designation)(dcn)
September 17, 2018 6 Amended Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by JXB 84 LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
September 17, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
September 17, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
September 17, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by JXB 84 LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
September 17, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01020-AJC, filed by JXB 84 LLC.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JXB 84 LLC v. Deutsche Bank National Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Kimberly Held Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JXB 84 LLC
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?