Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Tyrus Wheat
Defendant: TK Holdings Inc., Takata Corporation, Highland Industries, Inc., Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC and Mazda Motor Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv23880
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE of Remanding Case FLS C.A. No. 1:18-23880/LAE C.A. No. 2:18-08007 Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al pursuant to ( 3320 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 25 in 1:18-cv-23880-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FLS C.A. No. 1:18-23880/LAE C.A. No. 2:18-08007 Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al) re: MDL 2599. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a), the parties shall furnish the Clerk for the Southern District of Florida with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
March 14, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #25 Conditional Remand Order. Closing Case. (mc)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND (1:18-cv-23880-FAM Wheat v. Takata Corporation et al). The Court suggests to the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that these proceedings be remanded to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana re (23 in 1:18-cv-23880-FAM, 2694 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order Dismissing Party. Note: JPML notified. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/5/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:15-cv-20664-FAM, 1:18-cv-23880-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting (1060 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC's Motion Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/8/2019. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-23880-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting (1060 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendants Mazda Motor Corporation and Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC's Motion to Reopen Case for Purposes of Filing Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss, and Alternative Rule 12(b) to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to reopen the case and restore it to the Court's active calendar. Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss (DE 1060-1 in 14-24009) and Memorandum in Support (DE 1060-2 in 14-24009) no later than December 21, 2018. (Responses due by 12/21/2018). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/4/2018. (Related Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:18-cv-23880-FAM). See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING CASE, CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES, AND PLACING MATTER IN A CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE. Case No. 18-23880-CV-MORENO is STAYED. The Clerk of Court shall mark this cause as closed for statistical purposes. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-02599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:18-cv-08007 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:18-cv-23880-FAM. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-2599. (mc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (mc)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-08007. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order of MDL Transfer to Southern District of Florida. MDL case number is 2599. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(lag)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to TK Holdings, Inc. on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Hayes, DaShawn)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Highland Industries, Inc. on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Hayes, DaShawn)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/10/2018.(gec)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2599. (lag)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mazda Motor Corporation served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Hayes, DaShawn)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Highland Industries, Inc., Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC, Mazda Motor Corporation, TK Holdings, Inc., Takata Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Page 2 of Summons)(cg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to TK Holdings, Inc. filed by Tyrus Wheat re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Takata Corporation filed by Tyrus Wheat re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Mazda Motor Corporation filed by Tyrus Wheat re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC filed by Tyrus Wheat re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Highland Industries, Inc. filed by Tyrus Wheat re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 28, 2018 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7086738) (Hayes, DaShawn)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 8/24/2018. (caa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyrus Wheat. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, DaShawn) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (jeg).
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Tyrus Wheat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney DaShawn Paul Hayes added to party Tyrus Wheat(pty:pla).(Hayes, DaShawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheat v. Takata Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hood Auto Group of Hammond, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrus Wheat
Represented By: DaShawn Paul Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?