Dunn v. Perez

Appellee: Idelfonso Perez
Appellant: Marcia Dunn
Case Number: 1:2018cv23929
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 11 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part the appellant's motion for extension of time to file initial brief #10 . The scheduling order in this case #5 is vacated, as is the appellant's present filing deadline. This appeal cannot proceed until the designated record on appeal is transmitted by the bankruptcy clerk. The appellant timely filed a designation of record on appeal in the bankruptcy case (no. 17-23534-AJC) on October 4, 2018 (see D.E. 72 in the bankruptcy case), but no record has been designated to date. The clerk of bankruptcy court is directed to transmit that record by November 20, 2018, so this appeal can proceed. The Court will enter an amended scheduling order at that time, which will allow the Appellant seven days from the date of that order to file its initial brief. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
November 11, 2018 10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Marcia Dunn. Responses due by 11/26/2018 (Stull, Tyler)
November 6, 2018 Reset Deadlines Per DE#9. Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2018. (cqs)
November 5, 2018 9 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Appellant's motion for a five-day enlargement of time within which to file her initial brief in this bankruptcy appeal #8 . The Appellant's initial brief is now due by November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
November 5, 2018 8 MOTION for Extension of Time file initial brief re 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by Marcia Dunn. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Stull, Tyler)
October 19, 2018 7 Featured Case PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part the appellant's motion for extension of time to file initial brief #6 . The extension of time for the appellee to file his Designation of Record on Appeal until November 15, 2018, is immaterial to the appellant's ability to file its initial brief on the record it designated for this appeal. Appellant is also afforded the benefit of a reply to address any arguments raised in the appellee's response brief. Thus, the appellant's deadline to file its initial brief in this case is enlarged by 14 days, until November 7, 2018. The appellee's response brief is now due by December 3, 2018, with appellant's deadline to file its reply brief also enlarged until December 17, 2018. The February 11, 2019, oral argument remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
October 18, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief re #5 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by Marcia Dunn. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Stull, Tyler)
October 15, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Setting Oral Argument And Briefing Schedule In Bankruptcy Appeal. ( Oral Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 2/11/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.). ( Appellant's Initial Brief due by 10/24/2018, Appellant's Reply Brief due by 12/3/2018, Appellee's Response Brief due by 11/19/2018). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 24, 2018 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
September 24, 2018 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
September 24, 2018 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Marcia Dunn (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
September 24, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-23534-AJC, filed by Marcia Dunn.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Idelfonso Perez
Represented By: Jesus Novo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marcia Dunn
Represented By: Tyler Aaron Stull
Represented By: Michael P Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?