Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation v. Blanco et al
Plaintiff: Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Julio Lopez-Bermejo Rossello, Francisco Cortes, DBI Services, LLC, Carlos Manuel Manso Blanco, Ricardo Sanchez, Daniel Pinkerton, EAN Holdings, LLC, Elia Bonfante and Kimberly Pinkerton
Case Number: 1:2018cv24008
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Two Week Extension to Select Mediator. The deadline to selector the mediator is Wednesday, November 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/14/2018. (km02)
November 9, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator re #16 Order Referring Case to Mediation by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 11/23/2018 (Kiernan, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to #12 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Kiernan, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to #17 Answer to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Kiernan, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Daniel Pinkerton, Kimberly Pinkerton. Attorney Stephen Aaron Berkovits added to party Daniel Pinkerton(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Aaron Berkovits added to party Kimberly Pinkerton(pty:dft). (Berkovits, Stephen)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The Mediation Deadline is 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (km02)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for the two-week period commencing 7/8/2019 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 7/2/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (km02)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 Clerks Entry of Default as to EAN Holdings, LLC per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default Re: #13 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/26/2018. (lh)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (km02)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by DBI Services, LLC. (Green, Marlin)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. Kimberly Pinkerton served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Kiernan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. Daniel Pinkerton served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Kiernan, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation (Kiernan, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation (Kiernan, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marlin Kareem Green on behalf of DBI Services, LLC. Attorney Marlin Kareem Green added to party DBI Services, LLC(pty:dft). (Green, Marlin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. EAN Holdings, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Kiernan, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. DBI Services, LLC served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Kiernan, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos Manuel Manso Blanco, DBI Services, LLC, EAN Holdings, LLC, Daniel Pinkerton, Kimberly Pinkerton. (vmz)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11033421, filed by Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s))(Kiernan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation v. Blanco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Lopez-Bermejo Rossello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBI Services, LLC
Represented By: Marlin Kareem Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Manuel Manso Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pinkerton
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Berkovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elia Bonfante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Pinkerton
Represented By: Stephen Aaron Berkovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peak Property & Casualty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Michael Keegan Kiernan
Represented By: Ashley R Kellgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?