Nestor v. Dillworth

Appellee: Drew M. Dillworth
Appellant: Brenda Diana Nestor
Case Number: 1:2018cv24274
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal. Appellant failed to timely file the designation of the items for the record or its statement of the issues as required by Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Signed by Chief US Bankruptcy Judge Laurel M. Isicoff on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (jc)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Appeal, ECF No. #1 is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED. The Court is instructed to CLOSE this case, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/18/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring the parties to file certificates of interested parties by 10/31/18. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Brenda Diana Nestor (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 17-21187-LMI, filed by Brenda Diana Nestor.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nestor v. Dillworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Drew M. Dillworth
Represented By: Drew Michael Dillworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Brenda Diana Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?