MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC,et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI and MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Defendant: Stryker Corporation of Michigan, HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. and Stryker Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv24449
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 Joint RESPONSE to #8 Order Staying Case by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Ruiz, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Massachusetts as case 1:18-cv-12343, filed 11/08/2018. (bb)
November 8, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:18-cv-24449 electronically transferred out to Massachusetts. (mc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-36) transferring case to the District of Massachusetts re: MDL 2768 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Indira Talwani. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Courtesy Copy of Twentieth Notice of Potential Tag-Along Actions (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service)(mc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Corporation of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants SHALL respond to the Complaint no later than November 1. 2018. (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. response due 11/1/2018; Stryker Corporation response due 11/1/2018; Stryker Corporation of Michigan response due 11/1/2018). Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (cds)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint For Pure Bill Of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11107084, filed by Stryker Corporation, Stryker Corporation of Michigan, Howmedica Osteonics Corporation d/b/a Stryker Orthopedics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(McLoone, Jennifer) Text Modified on 10/26/2018 (cds).No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC,et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation of Michigan
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?