Braaf v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Humphrey S. Braaf
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24454
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD. Plaintiff has until January 9, 2019 to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Humphrey S. Braaf. (Parrish, Philip)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Tanner, Tyler)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. Attorney Jerry Dean Hamilton added to party Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.(pty:dft). (Hamilton, Jerry)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. Answer due 12/19/2018. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Humphrey S. Braaf. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. Attorney Tyler Jon Tanner added to party Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.(pty:dft). (Tanner, Tyler)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before January 23, 2019, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon the Defendant. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/4/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Harwin on behalf of Humphrey S. Braaf (Harwin, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.. (drz)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., a Liberian Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11107606, filed by Humphrey S. Braaf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Parrish, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braaf v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruise, LTD.
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Tyler Jon Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humphrey S. Braaf
Represented By: Philip Dixon Parrish
Represented By: Daniel Harwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?