MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, et al v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMP1 and MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Depuy Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24493
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:18-cv-03025, filed 11/13/2018. (bb)
November 13, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:18-cv-24493 electronically transferred out to Texas Northern. (mc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-306) transferring case to the Northern District of Texas re: MDL 2244 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable James Edgard Kinkeade. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE PENDING MDL TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/30/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Depuy Products, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services 1, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. Responses due by 11/13/2018 (Kruppa, Andrew)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11112119, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, et al v. Medical Device Business Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Series PMP1
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services 1, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Products, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?