MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Series PMPI
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2018cv24580
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE PENDING POTENTIAL TRANSFER TO MDL NO. 2782. The Court thus grants the Defendants' Unopposed Motion, ECF No. #4 , and stays this case pending the Panel's determination as to whether the transfer of this action is appropriate. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close this case, for statistical purposes only and without prejudice. The Court denies as moot the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time, ECF No. #5 . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jose E. Martinez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (yar)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Series PMPI, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC identifying Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent RD Legal Finance, LLC for MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Series PMPI; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE TO COUNSEL - The Clerk of the Panel has determined the listed action(s) is not appropriate for inclusion in this MDL. See Rule 7.1(b)(i). FLS/1:18-cv-24580. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 11/6/2018. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2782, FLS/1:18-cv-24580. (mc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Amended Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Related Cases, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 11/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kruppa, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Johnson & Johnson (Kruppa, Andrew)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar2)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11124804, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified on 11/1/2018 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Series PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?