Wortley v. Kapila

Appellant: Barbara Wortley
Appellee: Soneet R. Kapila
Case Number: 1:2018cv24581
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/22/2019. (jc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 12/01/2009 before Judge John K. Olson, 1-22 pages, Court Reporter: Oulette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2019. (dcn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Barbara Wortley (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation and Statement of Issues, #3 Items from 11-1998-AJC [ECF #1- #190], #4 Items from 11-1998-AJC [ECF #191- #387], #5 Items from Case #11-23492-AJC) [**Designated Exhibits will be transmitted conventionally and under separate cover**](dcn)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Denying #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (amb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Barbara Wortley re #11 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Transcripts) (Broeker, Douglas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Striking #11 Notice (Other) filed by Barbara Wortley by Barbara Wortley (Broeker, Douglas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance by Barbara Wortley re #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order (Broeker, Douglas)
December 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Barbara Wortley NOTICE REGARDING FILING OF 12/1/2009 HEARING TRANSCRIPT (Broeker, Douglas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance and Status Report by Barbara Wortley re #5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Hauser, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Barbara Wortley. (Hauser, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer filed by Soneet R. Kapila. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Avron, Paul)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Transfer by Barbara Wortley. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript Before District Judge Moreno)(Hauser, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Soneet R. Kapila (Avron, Paul)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING APPELLATE BRIEFS, RECORD TRANSCRIPTS, AND REQUESTS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Barbara Wortley (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 11-1998-AJC, filed by Barbara Wortley.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wortley v. Kapila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Wortley
Represented By: Douglas Crane Broeker
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Hauser
Represented By: Robert A. Sweetapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Soneet R. Kapila
Represented By: Heather Lena Ries
Represented By: Michael Richard Bakst
Represented By: Marla B. Neufeld
Represented By: Rilyn Anne Carnahan
Represented By: Morris Gary Miller
Represented By: Paul A. Avron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?