MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. COLOPLAST CORP. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI and MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC
Defendant: COLOPLAST CORP., Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC and Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv24582
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #25 Transmittal Letter Sent, #24 Order Remanding Case to State Court. (kpe)
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order ofRemand to: 11th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 18-30920-CA-32 (cqs)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Remanding Case to State Court; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 21, 2018 Filing 23 Defendant's RESPONSE to #22 Order, to Clarify Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Objections to Remand by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 Reset Deadlines Per DE#22 Miscellaneous Deadline 11/21/2018. (cqs)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Defendants have until November 21, 2018 to clarify the basis for the Courts subject matter jurisdiction and file any objections to remand. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Parties by COLOPLAST CORP., Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC (Henninger, Ursula)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent COLOPLAST CORP., Other Affiliate Coloplast A/S for Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC (Henninger, Ursula)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLOPLAST CORP. identifying Corporate Parent Coloplast A/S for COLOPLAST CORP. (Henninger, Ursula)
November 13, 2018 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm for SERIES PMPI; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Law Firm, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ruiz, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties by Mentor Worldwide, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ethicon, Inc., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson for Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mentor Worldwide, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ethicon, Inc., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson for Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 6, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: COLOPLAST CORP. response due 12/7/2018; Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC response due 12/7/2018; Mentor Worldwide, LLC response due 12/7/2018. (ps1)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall serve their combined response or separate answers to Plaintiffs; Complaint on or before December 7, 2018. The deadline for compliance with the Order of November 1, 2018 ([ECF No. #4 ) will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery re 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Striking #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 STRICKEN MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified on 11/6/2018 per DE #9 Notice of Stricking (kpe).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11124856, filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kruppa, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. COLOPLAST CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLOPLAST CORP.
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Manufacturing US, LLC
Represented By: Ursula Marie Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?