Cruz v. THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Cruz
Defendant: THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24610
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Agreed Motion to Extend Certain Time Frames Contained in Order Setting Trial Date and Pretrial Procedures. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim is extended from January 4, 2019 until January 18, 2019. The deadline for joinder of parties is extended from February 1, 2019 to February 15, 2019. The time to furnish opposing counsel with a written list containing the names and addresses of all fact witnesses intended to be called at trial is extended from February 15, 2019 until March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/28/2018. (ecz)
December 28, 2018 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Time Frames Contained in Order Setting Trial Date and Pretrial Procedures re #9 Scheduling Order by THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.. Responses due by 1/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER ON AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN TIME FRAMES CONTAINED IN ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL PROCEDURES)(Berman, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Martin S. Krezalek. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/21/2018. (km03)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Martin S. Krezalek. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11262757 by THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.. Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING)(Berman, Richard)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.. Attorney Richard E. Berman added to party THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Richard)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Rodolfo Cruz. THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Mendez, Diego)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by Rodolfo Cruz re #5 Statement filed by Rodolfo Cruz, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Mendez, Diego)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of: Claim by Rodolfo Cruz re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Mendez, Diego)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ecz)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. (ar2)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, and Jury Trial Demand against THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11131129, filed by Rodolfo Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Expert Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Expert CV, #4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons)(Mendez, Diego) Modified text on 11/2/2018 (ar2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Cruz
Represented By: Diego German Mendez
Represented By: Lydia Cira Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SWATCH GROUP (U.S.) INC.
Represented By: Martin S. Krezalek
Represented By: Richard E. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?