MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, et al v. Eli Lilly And Company et al
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and SERIES PMPI
Defendant: Eli Lilly And Company and Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv24617
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT Miami Dade Clerk of Circuit and County Courts as to #28 Transmittal Letter Sent (mee)
November 27, 2018 Filing 28 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit, Dade County, FL. State Court Case Number: 18-031983-CA-04. (caw)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Remanding Case to State Court; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/26/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 21, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Eli Lilly And Company Clarification to Basis for Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Objections to Remand (Camp, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI re #24 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #19 Amended Complaint,, . Attorney Gino Moreno added to party MSPA Claims 1, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gino Moreno added to party SERIES PMPI(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit W to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint) (Moreno, Gino)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs to File a Redacted Version of Exhibit "W" to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 Motion for Leave to File. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (nc)
November 19, 2018 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 22 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (648372)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Plaintiffs to File A Redacted Verison of Exhibit "W" to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ruiz, John) Modified Docket Text/Event per Chambers on 11/20/2018 (nc).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Defendant, Eli Lilly & Company, has until November 21, 2018 to clarify the basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction and file any objections to remand. Failure to do so will result in a remand of the case to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eli Lilly And Company filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Ruiz, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Parties by Eli Lilly And Company (Camp, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ruiz, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Eli Lilly And Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Camp, John)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery; Defendant Eli Lilly and Company and all other Defendants properly served, shall file a combined response to the Complaint, or separate answers, within the time permitted the last-served Defendant under the Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ruiz, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Eli Lilly And Company. Responses due by 11/23/2018 (Camp, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly And Company (Camp, John)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery by Eli Lilly And Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery by Eli Lilly And Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent RD Legal Finance, LLC for SERIES PMPI; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC (Ruiz, John)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases; Removal Status Report due by 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mee)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11132033, filed by Eli Lilly And Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC, et al v. Eli Lilly And Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Gino Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly And Company
Represented By: John Anderson Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John Anderson Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?