Streaminn Hub Inc. et al v. Gayle et al
Plaintiff: FM Records Music LLC, Kemar McGregor, Streaminn Hub Inc. and FM Records Music Inc.
Defendant: Long Chain Global Music, LLC, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle and Francine A. Gayle
Case Number: 1:2018cv24684
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Francine A. Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle, Long Chain Global Music, LLC. (Guerra, Richard)
December 31, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Kemar McGregor, Streaminn Hub Inc. by Long Chain Global Music, LLC, Francine A. Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Guerra, Richard)
December 24, 2018 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Streaminn Hub Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Notario, Roger)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Streaminn Hub Inc. (Notario, Roger)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Award and Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 filed by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Streaminn Hub Inc.. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Notario, Roger)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Streaminn Hub Inc.. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Notario, Roger)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants, filed by Streaminn Hub Inc., FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Notario, Roger)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Francine A. Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle, Long Chain Global Music, LLC (Perez-Pineiro, Rafael)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Award and Payment of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 by Francine A. Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle, Long Chain Global Music, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Francine A. Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle, Long Chain Global Music, LLC. Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Francine A. Gayle(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Ricardo Mascoska Gayle(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Guerra added to party Long Chain Global Music, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Kemar McGregor, Streaminn Hub Inc. (Thompson, Charles)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Notario on behalf of FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Kemar McGregor, Streaminn Hub Inc.. Attorney Roger Notario added to party FM Records Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Roger Notario added to party FM Records Music LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Roger Notario added to party Kemar McGregor(pty:pla), Attorney Roger Notario added to party Streaminn Hub Inc.(pty:pla). (Notario, Roger)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC, Kemar McGregor, Streaminn Hub Inc. 1:18-cv-24684-JEM (Thompson, Charles)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (AO 121 Form and a Copy of Complaint mailed 11/08/2018). (drz)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Francine Gayle, Ricardo Mascoska Gayle, Long Chain Global Music, LLC. (drz)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) Modified on 11/8/2018 (drz).
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT under 17 U.S.C. 501 against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11144491, filed by Streaminn Hub Inc., Kemar McGregor, FM Records Music Inc., FM Records Music LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Thompson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streaminn Hub Inc. et al v. Gayle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FM Records Music LLC
Represented By: Charles Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Roger Notario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemar McGregor
Represented By: Charles Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Roger Notario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streaminn Hub Inc.
Represented By: Charles Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Roger Notario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FM Records Music Inc.
Represented By: Charles Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Roger Notario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Chain Global Music, LLC
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Rafael A. Perez-Pineiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Mascoska Gayle
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Rafael A. Perez-Pineiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine A. Gayle
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Represented By: Rafael A. Perez-Pineiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?