MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI and MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2018cv24695
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 10 Order, by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kruppa, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson re #11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8, #9 Exhibit A-9, #10 Exhibit A-10, #11 Exhibit A-11, #12 Exhibit A-12, #13 Exhibit A-13, #14 Exhibit A-14) (Kruppa, Andrew)
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Kruppa, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kruppa, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Corporate Parent MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC for SERIES PMPI; Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC (Ruiz, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Hasan Ruiz on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC, SERIES PMPI (Ruiz, John)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER amending #11 . The removal status report is due December 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/19/2018. (eft)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER VACATING AND AMENDING 9 . Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery #5 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response by December 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/15/2018. (eft)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery. Plaintiffs shall file their response by December 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/15/2018. (eft)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Paul C. Huck recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Amanda E. Preston, mailing date November 13, 2018, (pt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/13/2018 to reflect correct document) (bb).
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint For Pure Bill Of Discovery . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) for Pure Bill of Discovery by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified Relief on 11/9/2018 (ls).
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Kruppa, Andrew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jao)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11148130, filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Research & Development, LLC. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES LLC et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Amanda E. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Amanda E. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Russell Kruppa
Represented By: Amanda E. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS I, LLC
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?