Yip v. Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
Plaintiff: Maria Yip
Defendant: Greene Espel PLLP, Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP and Grant Thornton LLP
Case Number: 1:2018cv24773
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting Defendants Motion to Withdraw Reference to Conduct a Jury Trial. The Court grants in part the motion to withdraw the reference ECF No. #1 The Court withdraws the reference to the Bankruptcy Court, in part, for the purpose of a jury trial should Cadwalader ultimately be entitled to one. The Court affirms the reference to the Bankruptcy Court in all other respects, including hearing and determining case-dispositive motions to the extent constitutionally permitted. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/6/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Clerks Notice Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vjk)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Response)(lle)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 18-01289-AJC., filed by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yip v. Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Yip
Represented By: James Daryl Gassenheimer
Represented By: Ashley Dillman Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Espel PLLP
Represented By: Solomon Brauner Genet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP
Represented By: Joaquin Jose Alemany
Represented By: Jose Angel Casal
Represented By: Robert William Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Thornton LLP
Represented By: Mark Andrew Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?