MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MAO-MSAO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Series, LLC and MSPA Claims X, LLC
Defendant: Tissue Science Laboratories, C. R. Bard, Inc., Sofradim Productions, SAS and Garretson Resolution Group
Case Number: 1:2018cv24842
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS #23 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Garretson Resolution Group. Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bloom, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #23 Amended Complaint, by C. R. Bard, Inc.. Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gallo, Sabrina)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #28 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re #23 Amended Complaint, by Garretson Resolution Group. Responses due by 1/3/2019 (Bloom, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Set Answer Due Deadline: C. R. Bard, Inc. response due 1/16/2019 per DE #27 Order. (kpe)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #25 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OMNIBUS ORDER. ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike and Incorporated Memorandum of Law; denying as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Complaint re #23 Amended Complaint, by C. R. Bard, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yagoda, Jay)
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **CORRECTION** Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Counsel shall contact the Court at 02:00 PM by calling the toll-free number provided. (gfw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Series, LLC, MAO-MSAO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lien)(Ruiz, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 22 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **CORRECTION** Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Counsel to contact the Court at 02:00 PM by calling the toll-free number provided. (gfw)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: (Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham.) Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines Per DE#20. Responses due by 12/18/2018 (cqs)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE ON OR BEFORE December 18, 2018; re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by C. R. Bard, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/13/2018. See attached document for DETAILS AS SET FORTH IN THE ORDER FOR FAILURE TO RESPOND. (cf)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Patrice W. Oppenheim. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Bruce A. Cranner. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/11/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by Garretson Resolution Group. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Bloom, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrice W. Oppenheim, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11228293 by Garretson Resolution Group. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(sk)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bruce A. Cranner, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11228270 by Garretson Resolution Group. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloom, Jason)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. ORDER granting #12 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Douglas A. Kahle terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Hunter Johnson on behalf of Garretson Resolution Group. Attorney Stephen Hunter Johnson added to party Garretson Resolution Group(pty:dft). (Johnson, Stephen)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Lydecker | Diaz for Schwed Kahle & Kress, PA by Garretson Resolution Group. Attorney Jason Benjamin Bloom added to party Garretson Resolution Group(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/21/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloom, Jason)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Garretson Resolution Group re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) of Consent to Removal (Kahle, Douglas)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. (Answer due 12/11/2018). Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #3 MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TOPLAINTIFFS' CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. (Answer due 12/11/2018.) Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 11/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) ( Responses due by 12/10/2018), MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 12/10/2018), MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Gallo, Sabrina)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Garretson Resolution Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahle, Douglas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A. Kahle on behalf of Garretson Resolution Group. Attorney Douglas A. Kahle added to party Garretson Resolution Group(pty:dft). (Kahle, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate C. R. Bard, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for C. R. Bard, Inc. (Gallo, Sabrina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by C. R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gallo, Sabrina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallo, Sabrina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Class Action) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11171517, filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., a corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gallo, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC et al v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tissue Science Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Andrew Yagoda
Represented By: Sabrina R. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofradim Productions, SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garretson Resolution Group
Represented By: Patrice W. Oppenheim
Represented By: Douglas A. Kahle
Represented By: Stephen Hunter Johnson
Represented By: Jason Benjamin Bloom
Represented By: Bruce A. Cranner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSAO Recovery II, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Series, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims X, LLC
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Losa
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?