Matos Rodriguez et al v. Pan American Health Organization
Plaintiff: Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez and Fidel Cruz Hernandez
Defendant: Pan American Health Organization, Joaquin Molina, Does No. 1-10 and Kleiman Alberto
Case Number: 1:2018cv24995
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William King Hill on behalf of Pan American Health Organization (Hill, William)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Patrick J. Carome is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendant for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Carome at patrick.carome@wilmerhale.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint For Violations of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act and Racketeering and Corrupt Influenced Organizations (RICO) Act against All Defendants, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Hernandez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez.(Dubbin, Samuel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Patrick J. Carome. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11264872 by Pan American Health Organization. Responses due by 1/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William King Hill on behalf of Pan American Health Organization. Attorney William King Hill added to party Pan American Health Organization(pty:dft). (Hill, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tatiana Carballo Gomez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia re #1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Correction to Complaint by Interlineation (Dubbin, Samuel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez. Pan American Health Organization served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Dubbin, Samuel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pan American Health Organization. (pes)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) Modified filed date on 11/30/2018 (pes).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pan American Health Organization. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11200451, filed by Ramona Matos Rodriguez, Fidel Cruz Rodriguez, Tatiana Carballo Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dubbin, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matos Rodriguez et al v. Pan American Health Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Matos Rodriguez
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Carballo Gomez
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russela Margarita Rivero Sarabia
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Cruz Rodriguez
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Cruz Hernandez
Represented By: Samuel Johnathan Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan American Health Organization
Represented By: Patrick J. Carome
Represented By: William King Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joaquin Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleiman Alberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?