United American Corp. v. Bitmain, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United American Corp.
Defendant: Jason Cox, Bitmain Technologies Ltd., Bitmain, Inc., Amaury Sechet, Bitmain Technologies Holding Company, Roger Ver, Jesse Powell, Payward Ventures, Inc., Shammah Chancellor, Saint Bitts LLC and Jihan Wu
Case Number: 1:2018cv25106
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 43 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell. Responses due by 2/15/2019 (Lourie, Andrew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bitmain, Inc.. Responses due by 2/15/2019 (Pace, Christopher)
February 1, 2019 Filing 41 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Shammah Chancellor. Responses due by 2/15/2019 (Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court allows Defendant Chancellor to exceed the page limitation by up to five (5) pages for his response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/29/2019. (eft)
January 28, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Shammah Chancellor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Rasmussen, McEvoy, York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/21/2019. (EGT)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING SERVICE. Any defendant not served within the time frame provided under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure--evidenced by proof of service filed to the docket--will be dismissed from this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/18/2019. (eft)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #35 Defendant Chancellor's motion to exceed page limit for response to complaint. Because Chancellor's deadline to file the response is two weeks away and Chancellor "continue[s] to work diligently" on shortening the response, the motion is DENIED as premature. Chancellor shall make all efforts to comply with the page limitation. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/18/2019. (eft)
January 11, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Shammah Chancellor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
January 10, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Julie E. McEvoy, Mark W. Rasmussen, Thomas D. York. Filing Fee $ 225.00 Receipt # 113C-11302830 by Bitmain, Inc.. Responses due by 1/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pace, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the second unopposed motion:Payward Ventures, Inc. and Jesse Powell's Response/Answer now due 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/10/2019. (EGT)
January 10, 2019 Filing 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Complaint by Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Lourie, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Payward Ventures, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Payward, Inc. for Payward Ventures, Inc. (Lourie, Andrew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Weinroth on behalf of Bitmain, Inc.. Attorney Marc Weinroth added to party Bitmain, Inc.(pty:dft). (Weinroth, Marc)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the opposed motion:Defendant Chancellor's Response/Answer now due 2/1/2019. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/9/2019. (EGT)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The motions materially comply with the Court's Local Rules on pro hac admissions. Therefore the Clerk shall add pro hac counsel Simmons, Robson, Zaslavsky, Liu and Quinn as co-counsel of record for Defendant Chancellor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/9/2019. (EGT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Shammah Chancellor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bitmain, Inc. (Pace, Christopher)
January 2, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Zhao Liu, Brian Quinn. Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 113C-11278811 by Shammah Chancellor. Responses due by 1/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ian Simmons, Katrina Robson, Sergei Zaslavsky. Filing Fee $ 225.00 Receipt # 113C-11278530 by Shammah Chancellor. Responses due by 1/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
December 28, 2018 Set Deadlines Bitmain, Inc. answer due 2/1/2019. (cqs)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS AMENDED ORDER re 22 Order on Expedited Motion. Defendant BITMAIN, INC.'s Response/Answer now due February 1, 2019. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/28/2018. (abu)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Expedited Motion for Extension of Time, for good cause shown. Defendant BITMAIN, INC.'s Response/Answer now due February 1, 2018. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/28/2018. (abu)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 ; #20 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Court finds that the applications satisfy the requirements of S.D. Fla. Local Atty. R. 4. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to add Donald Pepperman, Esq. and Brian E. Klein, Esq. as counsel of record for Defendants PAYWARD VENTURES, INC. and JESSE POWELL, and allow counsel to be noticed electronically on CM/ECF. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/28/2018. (abu)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian Klein. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11271082 by Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell. Responses due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Lourie, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant Bitmain, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Partially Agreed) re #1 Complaint, by Bitmain, Inc.. Attorney Christopher Rebel Jude Pace added to party Bitmain, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Pace, Christopher)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Donald Pepperman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11270977 by Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell. Responses due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Lourie, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown in the unopposed Motion, Defendant JESSE POWELL shall have until January 18, 2018 to file his Response/Answer to the Complaint. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/27/2018. (abu)
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint by Jesse Powell. Responses due by 1/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Lourie, Andrew)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown in the unopposed Motion, Defendant PAYWARD VENTURES, INC. shall have until January 18, 2018 to file its Response/Answer to the Complaint. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/27/2018. (abu)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint by Payward Ventures, Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Order)(Lourie, Andrew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew C Lourie on behalf of Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell. Attorney Andrew C Lourie added to party Payward Ventures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew C Lourie added to party Jesse Powell(pty:dft). (Lourie, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to #1 Complaint, for good cause shown in the partially unopposed motion:Defendant Shammah Chancellor's Response/Answer now due 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 12/21/2018. (EGT)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, (Partially Agreed) by Shammah Chancellor. Attorney Melissa Cade Pallett-Vasquez added to party Shammah Chancellor(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United American Corp. (Miller, Brian)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Roger Ver. (kpe)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by United American Corp. (Miller, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United American Corp. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Brian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bitmain Technologies Holding Company, Bitmain Technologies Ltd., Bitmain, Inc., Shammah Chancellor, Jason Cox, Payward Ventures, Inc., Jesse Powell, Saint Bitts LLC, Amaury Sechet, Jihan Wu. (pcs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11215891, filed by United American Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s))(Miller, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United American Corp. v. Bitmain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitmain Technologies Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitmain, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Weinroth
Represented By: Christopher Rebel Jude Pace
Represented By: Thomas D. York
Represented By: Mark W. Rasmussen
Represented By: Julie M. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaury Sechet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitmain Technologies Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Powell
Represented By: Donald Pepperman
Represented By: Brian E. Klein
Represented By: Andrew C Lourie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payward Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Pepperman
Represented By: Brian E. Klein
Represented By: Andrew C Lourie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shammah Chancellor
Represented By: Brian P. Quinn
Represented By: Zhao Liu
Represented By: Katrina Robson
Represented By: Melissa Cade Pallett-Vasquez
Represented By: Ian Simmons
Represented By: Sergei Zaslavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Bitts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jihan Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United American Corp.
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Joanne Gelfand
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?