Philippeaux v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Eddy Jean Philippeaux
Defendant: United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2018cv25238
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 1/11/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (vmz)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/28/2019. (chd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Lift the Stay re 16 Order on Motion to Stay by Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay. Defendant will notify the Court within 7 days of Congress appropriating funds and ending the shutdown. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/18/2019. (chd)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed U.S. Attorney's Office served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (vmz)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America. Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party Department of Veterans Affairs(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski added to party United States of America(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson-Pogorzelski, Anthony)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Motion For Leave To File A Second Supplement The Complaint Pursuant Rule 15(D) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure by Eddy Jean Philippeaux. (vmz)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Motion For Leave To Supplement The Complaint Pursuant Rule 15(D) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure By Adding A Claim Under Section 504 Of The Rehabilitation Act Of 1973 (29 U.S.C. J. 794a) #1 Complaint, by Eddy Jean Philippeaux. Responses due by 1/9/2019 (vmz) Modified on 12/26/2018 (vmz).
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #7 Order for Appointment of Special Process Server,, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Summons Prepared and Delivered to USMS) (vmz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs. (vmz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (vmz)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (vmz) Modified file date on 12/21/2018 (vmz).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server and granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses will be provided for USM Service. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/19/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Eddy Jean Philippeaux to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: eddyjean01@yahoo.com (kpe)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Eddy Jean Philippeaux. Responses due by 12/27/2018 (kpe)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddy Jean Philippeaux. (kpe)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT re Federal Tort Claims Act and Constitutional Challenge to Congressional Status 38 U.S.C. 511 against United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Eddy Jean Philippeaux.(kpe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #1 Exhibit) (kpe). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philippeaux v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Anthony Erickson-Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Jean Philippeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?