Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Pavon et al
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC and Dish Network L.L.C.
Defendant: Chandani Bacchus and Fabian Pavon
Case Number: 1:2018cv25240
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent EchoStar Corporation, Corporate Parent Kudelski SA, Corporate Parent Nagra USA, Inc. for Nagrastar LLC; Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH Orbital Corporation for Dish Network L.L.C. (Boatman, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. Chandani Bacchus served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Boatman, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. Fabian Pavon served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Boatman, James)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Chandani Bacchus, Fabian Pavon. (lk)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chandani Bacchus, Fabian Pavon. (ar2)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chandani Bacchus, Fabian Pavon. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11240514, filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) for Pavon, #3 Summon(s) for Bacchus)(Boatman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Pavon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagrastar LLC
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Boatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandani Bacchus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Pavon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?