Zapata v. Sullivan
Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Defendant: M.ED James Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2018cv25318
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #5 Order Dismissing Case. US Mail returned for: James Sullivan. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration regarding #5 Final Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #3 Order,. US Mail returned for: James Sullivan. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order Dismissing Case by Randy Zapata. (vmz)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Consent To Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Randy Zapata (vmz)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction and failure to comply with the one-claim-per-count rule. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, which comports with this Order no later than January 4, 2019. Failure to file an Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order will result in the Court closing the case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (km02)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy Zapata. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Randy Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.ED James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?