Curcio et al v. NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.
Plaintiff: George Walchusky, Jaime Mauricio Sanchez Morales, Stacy Curcio, Laurie Rail, Ella Morro, Michel Korman, S. C., D. B., C. L., Tanya Cruz Sanchez, Amy Lau, Jeremy Cohen, H. W., Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, Richard Scott, Kailey Savve, A. C., Timothy Reynolds, Sarah Schmidt, Fernando Cruz Contreras, Jeremey Korman, Lisa Walchusky, N. B., Christopher Betro, A. K., Kaitly Bonneville, Denise Scott, J. K., Suzi Korman, Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, G. C., John Doe, A. L., Malgorzata Bonneville and Melanie Korman
Defendant: NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25419
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Order of Consolidation on DE #11 Closing Case. (jao)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND REFERRAL Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 02/08/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 12, 2019 Cases associated. (jao)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Marcia G. Cooke for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 2/8/2019. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by NCL (Bahamas) Ltd. re #8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions of Filing Agreed Motion to Transfer, Consolidate and Consent to Magistrate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Motion to Transfer, Consolidate, and Consent to Magistrate) (Levitt, Lauren)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by NCL (Bahamas) Ltd. (Levitt, Lauren)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Ashley Levitt on behalf of NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.. Attorney Lauren Ashley Levitt added to party NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.(pty:dft). (Levitt, Lauren)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Seitz on behalf of NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.. Attorney William Robert Seitz added to party NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.(pty:dft). (Seitz, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by N. B., D. B., S. C., Timothy Reynolds, Jeremey Korman, George Walchusky, Christopher Betro, Stacy Curcio, H. W., Malgorzata Bonneville, Lisa Walchusky, Melanie Korman, Jeremy Cohen, A. K., A. C.(a minor), Tanya Cruz Sanchez, Suzi Korman, A. L., Kaitly Bonneville, Kailey Savve, Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, Ella Morro, Michel Korman, Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, J. K., Denise Scott, John Doe, C. L., Fernando Cruz Contreras, Jaime Mauricio Sanchez Morales, Amy Lau, G. C., Laurie Rail, Sarah Schmidt, Richard Scott. All Defendants. (Holzberg, Glenn)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery And Scheduling Conference And Order Referring Non-Dispositive Pretrial and Discovery Matters To The Magistrate Judge, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/27/2018. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.. (jao)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11266902, filed by N. B., D. B., S. C., Timothy Reynolds, Jeremey Korman, George Walchusky, Christopher Betro, Stacy Curcio, H. W., Malgorzata Bonneville, Lisa Walchusky, Melanie Korman, Jeremy Cohen, A. K., A. C., Tanya Cruz Sanchez, Suzi Korman, A. L., Kaitly Bonneville, Kailey Savve, Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez, Ella Morro, Michel Korman, Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker, J. K., Denise Scott, John Doe, C. L., Fernando Cruz Contreras, Jaime Mauricio Sanchez Morales, Amy Lau, G. C., Laurie Rail, Sarah Schmidt, Richard Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letters, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Holzberg, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curcio et al v. NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Walchusky
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Mauricio Sanchez Morales
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Curcio
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Rail
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Morro
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. B.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Cruz Sanchez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lau
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cohen
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. W.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Fernando Cruz Sanchez
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailey Savve
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Reynolds
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Schmidt
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Cruz Contreras
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremey Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Walchusky
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. B.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Betro
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitly Bonneville
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Scott
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. K.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzi Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Patricia Sanchez Baker
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. C.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malgorzata Bonneville
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Korman
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCL (Bahamas) Ltd.
Represented By: Lauren Ashley Levitt
Represented By: William Robert Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?