Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc. et al v. Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.
Plaintiff: West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc. and Doctors Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv25460
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc.. (Lines, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #24 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Composite Ex. A)(Frick, Irene)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Stay. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (mms)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Resetting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re-set for 3/8/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ira Spector on behalf of Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. Attorney David Ira Spector added to party Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.(pty:dft). (Spector, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc.. (Lines, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation Defendant Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of Motion to Compel Arbit filed by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Peoples, Gera)
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peoples, Gera)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to #9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Frick, Irene)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation Defendant Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of Motion to Compel Arbit filed by Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 1/29/2019. (Lines, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Baptist Health South Florida, Inc. for Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc. (Ajizian, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation filed by Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc.. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Manual)(Lines, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Incorporated, Other Affiliate United HealthCare Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Sandra L Heller, Other Affiliate Akerman LLP, Other Affiliate Gera R Peoples, Other Affiliate Irene Bassel Frick, Other Affiliate Christopher A Ajizian, Other Affiliate Isicoff Ragatz, Other Affiliate David Lines, Other Affiliate Eric D. Isicoff for Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc. (Peoples, Gera)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/25/2019, Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: Counsel is not admitted to this Court's Bar under the name listed in the Notice of Removal documents. Attorney Admissions does not have an Order from the Supreme Court of Florida changing local counsel's name; therefore, local counsel must file documents under the name which is listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Irene Adel Bassel. re #5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Irene Bassel Frick, mailing date January 2, 2019, (pt) (pt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING #9 Motion to Compel Arbtration and #10 Motion to Stay to Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene Adel Bassel on behalf of Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. Attorney Irene Adel Bassel added to party Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bassel, Irene)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Peoples, Gera)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation Defendant Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Determination of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Peoples, Gera)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbtration and Stay the Litigation by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. Responses due by 1/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Lubowitz, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lubowitz (Medica Hospital Provider Agreement), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lubowitz (2018 UnitedHealthcare Care Provider Adminstrative Guide))(Peoples, Gera)
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 6 : Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc. response due 1/4/2019. (lk)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peoples, Gera)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Defendant SHALL respond no later than January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/2/2019. (gco)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Irene Bassel Frick, mailing date January 2, 2019, (pt)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peoples, Gera)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc., South Miami Hospital, Inc., Doctors Hospital, Inc., Homestead Hospital, Inc. and West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc. vs. Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc., Case No. 2018-038504-CA-01) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11273497, filed by Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Service of Process, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Exhibit Composite Ex. 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Composite Ex. 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Declaration - Evidence of Coverage, #7 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Declaration - Evidence of Coverage)(Peoples, Gera) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/2/2019) (ar2). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (ar2). Modified text on 1/2/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc. et al v. Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Kendall Baptist Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Ara Ajizian
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Miami Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Ara Ajizian
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homestead Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Ara Ajizian
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Hospital of Miami, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Ara Ajizian
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctors Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Daniel Isicoff
Represented By: Christopher Ara Ajizian
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Represented By: Eric David Isicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medica Healthcare Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Irene Bassel Frick
Represented By: Gera R. Peoples
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Heller
Represented By: David Ira Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?