Coleman v. C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: Richard B. Coleman
Defendant: C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. and C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20130
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
1 Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended Complaint due by 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 6, 2019 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2019 re #19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Daniel Joseph Butler, Mendy Halberstam, Miriam Brooks, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ssi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. (Halberstam, Mendy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard B. Coleman. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Brooks, Miriam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 2/28/2019 (Halberstam, Mendy)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana; Mediation Hearing set for 6/12/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. Mediation Hearing set for 06/12/2019 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Halberstam, Mendy)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard B. Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brooks, Miriam)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Mediation Deadline 7/22/2019., Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Butler, Daniel)
January 21, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties by Richard B. Coleman (Brooks, Miriam)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2019 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT (Removal) by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Halberstam, Mendy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC. (Butler, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 1/31/2019 (Butler, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Attorney Brody Max Shulman terminated, per #6 Notice of Non-Association. (ps1)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Richard B. Coleman OF NON-ASSOCIATION (Shulman, Brody)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Joseph Butler on behalf of C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC., C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.. Attorney Daniel Joseph Butler added to party C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Joseph Butler added to party C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.(pty:dft). (Butler, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11299037, filed by C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC., C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit Notification of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Halberstam, Mendy) Modified text on 1/10/2019 (ar2). (No answer/motion to dismiss filed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & S WHOLESALE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Mendy Halberstam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & S WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC.
Represented By: Mendy Halberstam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard B. Coleman
Represented By: Jason Saul Remer
Represented By: Brody Max Shulman
Represented By: Miriam Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?