Gordon v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Gordon
Defendant: Assistant Warden of Programs, Mr. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, Ms. Hockaday, Sgt. Gary Peterson, Warden, Everglades Correctional Institution and Lt. Thompson
Case Number: 1:2019cv20141
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
0 Judge: Lisette M Reid
1 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT on or before April 1, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, signed under the penalty of perjury, providing a short and plain statement of a claim for relief, a basis for federal jurisdiction, and a demand for judgment. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/1/2019 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) (fbn)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. On or before March 15, 2019, the supporting financial statement is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid (bca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johnny Gordon. (pes)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00. IFP Filed, filed by Johnny Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden of Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Hockaday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Gary Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, Everglades Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?