NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC v. Lexi Development Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC
Defendant: Banco Popular North America, Lexi North Bay, LLC, Bank Midwest, NA, Fifth Third Bank, First Third Bank NA, Lexi Development Company, Inc. and Regions Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv20188
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric W. Ostroff (Ostroff, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #7 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dpa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included to Stay Trial Pending Disposition of Renewed Motion to Withdraw Reference for Trial filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VAC Ex. BB, #2 Exhibit B - VAC Ex. CC)(Yates, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included to Stay Trial Pending Disposition of Renewed Motion to Withdraw Reference for Trial filed by NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC. Replies due by 1/24/2019. (Salinas, Alexander)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul D. Friedman on behalf of NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC (Friedman, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric W. Ostroff on behalf of Lexi Development Company, Inc.. Attorney Eric W. Ostroff added to party Lexi Development Company, Inc. (pty:dft). (Ostroff, Eric)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included to Stay Trial Pending Disposition of Renewed Motion to Withdraw Reference for Trial. Expedited Responses due by 1/17/2019 (lh)see Order DE# 13
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. This MATTER is before the Court on Defendant Regions Bank's Emergency Motion to Stay Trial #7 . The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to file an expedited Response to Defendant's motion by no later than 6:00 p.m., January 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/16/2019. (dpa)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 01/15/2019. Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Regions Bank re #7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included to Stay Trial Pending Disposition of Renewed Motion to Withdraw Reference for Trial of Filing Transcript of January 10, 2019 Bankruptcy Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10-19 Bankruptcy Hearing Tr.) (Yates, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip A. Allen, III on behalf of Regions Bank. Attorney Philip A. Allen, III added to party Regions Bank(pty:dft). (Allen, Philip)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Stuart Garbett on behalf of Regions Bank. Attorney David Stuart Garbett added to party Regions Bank(pty:dft). (Garbett, David)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included to Stay Trial Pending Disposition of Renewed Motion to Withdraw Reference for Trial by Regions Bank. Responses due by 1/29/2019 (Yates, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Regions Bank re #5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions (Supplemental Notice) (Yates, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Regions Bank (Yates, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Filing of Motion to Withdraw Reference Pursuant to 28 USC 157(d) with District Court (jc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) to Withdraw Reference filed by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 NBV's Response, #3 Region's Reply, #4 Region's List of Designated Items, #5 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 1 [Attachments 1-25], #6 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 2 [Attachments 26-50], #7 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 3 [Attachments 51-75], #8 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 4 [Attachments 76-100], #9 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 5 [Attachments 101-125], #10 Movant's Designation- ECF #1 Part 6 [Attachments 126-150], #11 Movant's Designation - ECF #1 Part 7 [Attachments 151-175], #12 Movant's Designation - ECF #1 Part 8 [Attachments 176-200], #13 Movant's Designation - ECF #1 Part 9 [Attachments 201], #14 Movant's Designation ECF #9 - ECF #262, #15 Movant's Supplemental Designation ECF #415, #16 Respondent's Designation)(dcn)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (COMPLAINT) to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court case number 16-1754-AJC., filed by Regions Bank.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC v. Lexi Development Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular North America
Represented By: Anna Marie Gamez
Represented By: Joaquin Jose Alemany
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexi North Bay, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Midwest, NA
Represented By: Anna Marie Gamez
Represented By: Joaquin Jose Alemany
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Anna Marie Gamez
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Crossland
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Represented By: Julie Singer Brady
Represented By: Andrew V Layden
Represented By: Robert Douglas Sowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Third Bank NA
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexi Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Marie Gamez
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Represented By: Peter Dumas Russin
Represented By: Eric W. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Dombovary
Represented By: Brian P Yates
Represented By: David Stuart Garbett
Represented By: Philip A. Allen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBV Loan Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Anna Marie Gamez
Represented By: Alexander Antonio Salinas
Represented By: Paul D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?