Garnett v. Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Malvin Garnett
Defendant: TWU International, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO, TWU555 and Local Union Defendants
Case Number: 1:2019cv20291
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to AFL-CIO. (mc)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to TWU International. (lk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to TWU555. (lk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/5/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100182407. (vt)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. (pes)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Malvin Garnett. (pes)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local Union Defendants, TWU International, TWU555, Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Malvin Garnett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnett v. Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWU International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Workers Union of America, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWU555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malvin Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?