Rodriguez v. ALS Commercial Funding, LLC

Appellant: Janet Rodriguez
Appellee: ALS Commercial Funding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv20452
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal for Failure by Appellant(s) to Timely File Designation or Statement of Issues, Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge Robert A. Mark on 2/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (jc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #7 Emergency Motion to Stay and Order Dismissing Appeal. Rodriguez's appeal is moot and the Court must dismiss this case. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. The Court denies as moot any pending motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Emergency #7 Motion to Stay, by Janet Rodriguez. (kpe)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit to Emergency #7 MOTION to Stay by Janet Rodriguez. (kpe)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Appeal in Bankruptcy Court by Janet Rodriguez. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (drz)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Janet Rodriguez. (kpe)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation and Brief by Janet Rodriguez. (kpe)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jua)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Janet Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(lle)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 18-21104-RAM, filed by Janet Rodriguez.(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. ALS Commercial Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Janet Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ALS Commercial Funding, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Gielchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?