United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC and Salt Energy, LLC
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv20473
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:0270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Salt Energy, LLC. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Elder, David)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2019. (mmc)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Salt Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Elder, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lexon Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Task Order, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jonathan Ahmed)(Eichhorn, Cory)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexon Insurance Company (Eichhorn, Cory)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lexon Insurance Company. (ebz)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Lexon Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11370243, filed by United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s))(Elder, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC
Represented By: David Roy Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Energy, LLC
Represented By: David Roy Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Cory William Eichhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?