KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC v. DENISON YACHTING LLC

Plaintiff: KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC
Defendant: DENISON YACHTING LLC, The Multihull Company, LLC, Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc., Denison Yacht Sales, Inc., Boats Group, LLC, Maverick Yachts, CC and Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv20495
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Joseph Barsky on behalf of The Multihull Company, LLC. Attorney Daniel Joseph Barsky added to party The Multihull Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Barsky, Daniel)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #36 Defendant The Multihull Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendant The Multihull Company, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/4/2019. (ean)
April 4, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by The Multihull Company, LLC re #36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint, of Filing Proposed Order (Bagliebter, Gary)
April 4, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint, by The Multihull Company, LLC. Responses due by 4/18/2019 (Bagliebter, Gary)
April 4, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Marc Bagliebter on behalf of The Multihull Company, LLC. Attorney Gary Marc Bagliebter added to party The Multihull Company, LLC(pty:dft). (Bagliebter, Gary)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/2/2019. (ean)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report and proposed order on or before May 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/2/2019. (ean)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. (Rothman, Joel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Joint Scheduling Report re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Responses due by 4/16/2019 (Rothman, Joel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boats Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BG Holdings, Inc. for Boats Group, LLC (Shore, Joshua)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT LUKE BROWN YACHT SALES. LLC re #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC, Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 03/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of record. Christian Jay Sanchelima withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 03/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
March 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Christian Sanchelima for / by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Responses due by 4/9/2019 (Sanchelima, Christian)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robert N. Potter. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 03/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
March 26, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. The Multihull Company, LLC served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC, ONLY by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC (Rothman, Joel)
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert N. Potter. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11489998 by Boats Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shore, Joshua)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Defendant Denison Yacht Sales, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendant Denison Yacht Sales, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before April 22, 2019. Moreover, the parties are directed to timely comply with this Court's Order requiring a joint scheduling report and proposed order #6 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/18/2019. (ean)
March 18, 2019 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Amended Complaint, by Denison Yacht Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Theresa)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Montalbano Bennett on behalf of Denison Yacht Sales, Inc.. Attorney Theresa Montalbano Bennett added to party Denison Yacht Sales, Inc. (pty:dft). (Bennett, Theresa)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Defendant Boats Group, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Boats Group, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 12, 2019. Moreover, the parties are directed to timely comply with this Court's Order requiring a joint scheduling report and proposed order #6 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/14/2019. (ean)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Amended Complaint, by Boats Group, LLC. Attorney Joshua Shore added to party Boats Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shore, Joshua)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Denison Yacht Sales, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #10 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Boats Group, LLC served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Boats Group, LLC, Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc., Denison Yacht Sales, Inc., Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC, Maverick Yachts, CC, The Multihull Company, LLC. (pes)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC (Rothman, Joel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC re #10 Amended Complaint, filed by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Denison Yacht Sales, Inc., #2 Summon(s) Maverick Yachts, CC, #3 Summon(s) The Multihull Company, LLC, #4 Summon(s) Boats Group, LLC, #5 Summon(s) Luke Brown Yacht Sales, Inc., #6 Summon(s) Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc.) (Rothman, Joel)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Denison Yacht Sales, Inc., Maverick Yachts, CC, The Multihull Company, LLC, Boats Group, LLC, Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC, Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc., filed by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Photos, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement)(Rothman, Joel)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC instead of prior counsel of record Christian Sanchelima. (Rothman, Joel)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. Attorney Joel Benjamin Rothman added to party KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC(pty:pla). (Rothman, Joel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DENISON YACHTING LLC. (pes)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC (Sanchelima, Christian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (jao)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits) (jao)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENISON YACHTING LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11374106, filed by KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sanchelima, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC v. DENISON YACHTING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOKO PRODUCTIONS & PHOTOGRAPHY CC
Represented By: Christian Jay Sanchelima
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISON YACHTING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Multihull Company, LLC
Represented By: Gary Marc Bagliebter
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Barsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Harbor Boating School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denison Yacht Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Montalbano Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boats Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert N. Potter
Represented By: Joshua Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Yachts, CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Brown Yacht Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?