Concept Boats, Inc.

Petitioner: Concept Boats, Inc.
Respondent: Jerrica Knowles and Dan Hardee
Case Number: 1:2019cv20526
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0185
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Respondent, Dan Hardee's, unopposed Motion to Dismiss Concept's Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. Petitioner shall file an amended petition on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Concept Boats, Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gambach, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesse Daniel Drawas on behalf of Dan Hardee. Attorney Jesse Daniel Drawas added to party Dan Hardee(pty:res). (Drawas, Jesse)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki on behalf of Dan Hardee. Attorney Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki added to party Dan Hardee(pty:res). (Dmiszewicki, Aaron)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Concept Boats, Inc.. (Gambach, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#14]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing SERVICE (Proof) by Publication by Concept Boats, Inc.. Last Publication date 3/20/2019. Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc., due by 4/19/2019. (ls)(See Image at DE #13)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Concept Boats, Inc. of Filing Proof of Publication (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Publication) (Gambach, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dan Hardee. Attorney Charles Stuart Davant added to party Dan Hardee(pty:res). Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Davant, Charles)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Concept Boats, Inc. by Jerrica Knowles. Attorney Scott Thomas McCullough added to party Jerrica Knowles(pty:res). (McCullough, Scott)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 MONITION AND INJUNCTION Re: #9 Order Approving the Ad Interim Stipulation and for Monition and Injunction. (ar2) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/22/2019) (ar2).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING THE AD INTERIM STIPULATION AND FOR MONITION AND INJUNCTION, granting #7 Motion for Entry of Order Approving the Ad Interim Stipulation and Monition and Issuing Injunction. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ra)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/14/2019. (isc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Order Approving the Ad Interim Stipulation and Monition and Issuing Injunction by Concept Boats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ad Interim Stipulation for Costs and Value, #2 Exhibit B - Order Approving the Ad Interim Stipulation and for Monition and Injunction, #3 Exhibit C - Monition and Injunction)(Gambach, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Concept Boats, Inc. of Filing Ad Interim Stipulation and Monition and Injunction and Issuing Injunction (Gambach, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Concept Boats, Inc. (Gambach, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Concept Boats, Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Gambach, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against Concept Boats, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11381760, filed by Concept Boats, Inc..(Gambach, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concept Boats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Concept Boats, Inc.
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Represented By: Evan S. Gutwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerrica Knowles
Represented By: Scott Thomas McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Hardee
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Drawas
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?