Taylor-Duncan v. Western World Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Marilyn Taylor-Duncan
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv20528
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Western World Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Timeline per [DE3])(Stape, Maxwell)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court requires the parties to file their joint discovery plan and conference report. Previously, the Court ordered the parties to file that report 35 days, at the latest, after February 19, 2019, or by March 26, 2019. See Initial Order #3 . The parties failed to comply with this deadline. The Court orders the parties to submit their joint discovery plan and conference report by April 3, 2019. The Court notes that, despite removing this case to this Court, the Defendant failed to timely respond to the complaint and only did so when prompted by the Court. Having elected a federal forum, the Defendant is required to abide by the this Court's orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Future violations of either may result in sanctions, up to and including the striking of a party's pleadings or dismissal of this case. Cf. Powell v. Siegal, 447 F. App'x 92, 94 (11th Cir. 2011) (Rule 16(f) authorizes a court to impose sanctions, including dismissal under Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(v), if a party fails to obey a pretrial order.). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (zlz)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Western World Insurance Company. (Seibert, Troy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order on Clerks Default Procedure, copy has been mailed out via U.S. Mail. (jao)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Clerks Default Procedure; The Court orders the Plaintiff to submit a Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 02/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, (Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mno)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint), No Answer/No Motion To Dismiss, Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11381883, filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Executed Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings)(Seibert, Troy) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (vmz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor-Duncan v. Western World Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Taylor-Duncan
Represented By: Stephanie Puente Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Troy Jonathan Seibert
Represented By: Maxwell Harrison Stape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?