Joyce v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Sabine Joyce
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20532
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two week period starting 11/12/2019 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (ap00) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. (Probst, Bryan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sabine Joyce. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Gerson, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11382060, filed by Sabine Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gerson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyce v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabine Joyce
Represented By: Nicholas I. Gerson
Represented By: David L Markel
Represented By: Edward Steven Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?