Barrios v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION

Plaintiff: Luis Barrios
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv20534
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint re Affirmative Defense Nos. 2 and 7 filed by Carnival Corporation. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ticket Contract)(Tejera, Valentina)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Frank J. Allocca. Mediation Hearing set for 4/22/2019 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/3/2019. (mmc)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Luis Barrios re Potential Trial Conflict (Hernandez, Eduardo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Frank J. Allocca. Mediation Hearing set for 4/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m.. (Nicholson, Allene)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Frank J. Allocca. Mediation Hearing set for 4/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tejera, Valentina)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint re Affirmative Defense Nos. 2 and 7 by Luis Barrios. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Hernandez, Eduardo)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the two-week trial period commencing 11/12/2019 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 11/5/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Luis Barrios (Hernandez, Eduardo)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Tejera, Valentina)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Valentina M. Tejera added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Tejera, Valentina)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Luis Barrios. Carnival Corporation served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Hernandez, Eduardo)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (drz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11382221, filed by Luis Barrios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hernandez, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrios v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Barrios
Represented By: Eduardo Jesus Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Valentina M. Tejera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?