Ranson v. Florida Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Gerry L. Ranson
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2019cv20697
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Letter re no strike in Tampa Division from Gerry Ranson (mee)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint filed by Gerry L. Ranson; Recommending that: (1) the complaint DE #1 be DISMISSED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and Dupree v. Palmer, 284 F.3d 1234, 1237 (11th Cir. 2002); (2) any pending motions not otherwise ruled upon be dismissed; (3) this case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Exhibits to be made part of the federal record. Clerk mailed a copy of all Exhibits to Plaintiff. (Attachments: (Main Attachment) Exhibit, #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (fbn)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-00376. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/21/2019. (SM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Corrections filed by Gerry L. Ranson.(Filing fee not paid.) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranson v. Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry L. Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?