Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.179.64
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.179.64
Consolidated Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.199.135.251
Case Number: 1:2019cv20759
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Windstream Communications Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Atlantic Broadband Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate Rachel E Walker, Esq., Other Affiliate Greenspoon Marder, LLP for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/11/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-20759-JEM, 1:19-cv-20769-JEM (cds)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.179.64. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11427191, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.179.64
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.179.64
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 216.199.135.251
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?