Martinez v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rossy Martinez
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20808
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. A mediation conference in this matter shall be held with Michael C. Siboni, Esq. on September 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. at Bowman and Brooke, LLP, Two Alhambra Plaza, Suite 800, Coral Gables, Florida 33134. This date shall not be rescheduled without leave of Court, which will not be granted absent a motion setting forth good cause. The parties are responsible for ensuring that within three business days of the mediation, a mediation report is filed, indicating whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/18/2019. (jws)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Rudock, Robert)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 3/10/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Rossy Martinez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Schedule Jointly Proposed By the Parties)(Layne, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practice In Removal Cases Status Report due by 3/22/2019 Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (vmz) Modified on 3/5/2019 (vmz).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (vmz)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vmz)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11437836, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. Answer Filed/No Motion To Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Fender, Loren) Modified on 3/1/2019 (vmz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Robert John Rudock
Represented By: Loren William Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert John Rudock
Represented By: Loren William Fender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossy Martinez
Represented By: Paul Jon Layne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?