Solid Wireless, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Solid Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv20845
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Final Order of Dismissal and Order Denying All Pending Motions as Moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/26/2019. (ap00)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Solid Wireless, Inc. (Mandel, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Solid Wireless, Inc.. (Mandel, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Solid Wireless, Inc.. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Mandel, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (jao)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Solid Wireless, Inc. (Mandel, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Expedited Motion for Return of Property against Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11443525, filed by Solid Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit (A) Inventory Seized, #4 Exhibit (B) Search Warrant)(Mandel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid Wireless, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solid Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: David Scott Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?