VEGGIFRUIT, INC. v. Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: VEGGIFRUIT, INC. and GAIA PRODUCE, LLC
Defendant: Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. and Alejandro Badilla
Case Number: 1:2019cv21039
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Alejandro Badilla, Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lbc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GAIA PRODUCE, LLC, VEGGIFRUIT, INC. re #13 Order to Show Cause (Barmat, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Default Judgment by GAIA PRODUCE, LLC, VEGGIFRUIT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Troy Bennett, #2 Declaration of Eyal Nahoumovich, #3 Declaration of Marc P. Barmat, #4 Declaration of Blake A. Surbey, #5 Exhibit 1 - Veggiefruit PACA License, #6 Exhibit 2 - Cooq PACA License, #7 Exhibit 3 - Invoice, #8 Exhibit 4 - Decision and Order, #9 Exhibit 5 - Order on Reconsideration, #10 Exhibit 6 - Gaia PACA License, #11 Exhibit 7 - Gaia Invoice, #12 Exhibit 8 - Interest, #13 Exhibit 9 - FurrCohen Fees, #14 Exhibit 10 - McCarron Diess Fees)(Barmat, Marc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment by GAIA PRODUCE, LLC, VEGGIFRUIT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barmat, Marc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Clerks Entry of Default as to Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc., Alejandro Badilla. Motions Terminated: #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/30/2019. (lbc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by VEGGIFRUIT, INC., GAIA PRODUCE, LLC. (Barmat, Marc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #6 Amended Complaint, with a 14 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by VEGGIFRUIT, INC., GAIA PRODUCE, LLC. Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/23/2019. (Barmat, Marc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GAIA PRODUCE, LLC, VEGGIFRUIT, INC. re #6 Amended Complaint, (Barmat, Marc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VEGGIFRUIT, INC., GAIA PRODUCE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoices, #2 Exhibit Gaia Invoices, #3 Exhibit Decision and Order, #4 Exhibit Order on Reconsideration)(Barmat, Marc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by VEGGIFRUIT, INC.. Alejandro Badilla served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019; Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Barmat, Marc)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 6/10/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (chd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alejandro Badilla, Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.. (cds)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11484666, filed by VEGGIFRUIT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2)(Barmat, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VEGGIFRUIT, INC. v. Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VEGGIFRUIT, INC.
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIA PRODUCE, LLC
Represented By: Marc Philip Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooq Merchants & Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Badilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?