Butters v. Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jake Ryan Butters
Defendant: Alex De La Rotta, Related ISG International Realty, LLC, IRG Corporation and Alexis De La Rotta, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21052
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/9/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Consent Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta (Rubio, Felipe)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot #22 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement re: Related ISG International Realty, LLC by Jake Ryan Butters (McCaffery, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Reset Deadlines Per DE#25. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (cqs)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #22 on or before June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/20/2019. (jza)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss #14 Amended Complaint by Jake Ryan Butters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCaffery, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Related ISG International Realty, LLC (Brodsky, Benjamin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #14 Amended Complaint by Related ISG International Realty, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Brodsky, Benjamin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta. (Rubio, Felipe)
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta (Rubio, Felipe)
May 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines Related ISG International Realty, LLC answer due 4/10/2019 Per DE#19. (cqs)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC's #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC shall file its response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before May 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/6/2019. (jza)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Amended Complaint by Related ISG International Realty, LLC. (Brodsky, Benjamin)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time and Telephonic Participation at Scheduling Conference. Parties shall submit their Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements as required by this Court's prior order by May 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC's #10 Motion to Dismiss or For More Definite Statement. Plaintiff has filed his First Amended Complaint #14 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/29/2019. (jza)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to hold scheduling conference re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Jake Ryan Butters. Responses due by 5/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCaffery, Robert)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta, Related ISG International Realty, LLC, filed by Jake Ryan Butters.(McCaffery, Robert)
April 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. answer due 5/3/2019; Alex De La Rotta answer due 5/3/2019 Per DE#13. (cqs)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendants Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. and Alexis De La Rotta's #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. and Alexis De La Rotta shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/25/2019. (jza)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubio, Felipe)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Felipe Rubio on behalf of Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta. Attorney Felipe Rubio added to party Alexis De La Rotta, P.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Felipe Rubio added to party Alex De La Rotta(pty:dft). (Rubio, Felipe)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Related ISG International Realty, LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (Brodsky, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Related ISG International Realty, LLC shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/10/2019. (jza)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Related ISG International Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brodsky, Benjamin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Henry Brodsky on behalf of Related ISG International Realty, LLC. Attorney Benjamin Henry Brodsky added to party Related ISG International Realty, LLC(pty:dft). (Brodsky, Benjamin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jake Ryan Butters. Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; Alex De La Rotta served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019; IRG Corporation served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Related ISG International Realty, LLC served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(McCaffery, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (ar2)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta, IRG Corporation, Related ISG International Realty, LLC. (ar2)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., Alex De La Rotta, IRG Corporation, Related ISG International Realty, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11487475, filed by Jake Ryan Butters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Alexis De La Rotta, P.A., #3 Summon(s) Related ISG Realty, LLC, #4 Summon(s) IRG Corporation, #5 Summon(s) Alex De La Rotta)(McCaffery, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butters v. Alexis De La Rotta, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Ryan Butters
Represented By: Robert John McCaffery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex De La Rotta
Represented By: Felipe Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Related ISG International Realty, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Henry Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRG Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis De La Rotta, P.A.
Represented By: Felipe Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?