Tarsia v. Dobbs et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Tarsia
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Warden Brian Dobbs and FCI Miami
Case Number: 1:2019cv21145
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (eso)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE 28 U.S.C. 2241-FIRST STEP ACT on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nicholas Tarsia; Recommending that this petition be DISMISSED without prejudice, and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 5/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. by Nicholas Tarsia. (mee) Modified to terminate motion and to modify text on 3/26/2019 (asl).
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. NOT PAID/NO IFP., filed by Nicholas Tarsia.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarsia v. Dobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Dobbs
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Miami
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Tarsia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?