ROMANO et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA)
Plaintiff: ERIC ROMANO and Todd Romano
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA)
Case Number: 1:2019cv21147
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jzn)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quintana, Marlene)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Calendar Call Hearing set before prior presiding judge (Altonaga) terminated. (wc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND REQUIRING MEDIATION. Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (jdo) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman: Scheduling Conference held on 5/23/2019. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Marlene Quintana, James O. Fleckner, Gabrielle Lisa Gould, Alissa Del Riego, Christian D. Searcy, John Scarola, Matthew Weinshall (Digital 15:30:14) (tb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 5/23/2019 at 03:30 PM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. The parties shall abide by the following call-in procedure: (1) dial 1-888-684-8852; (2) enter Access Code Number 8004594, followed by the # sign; and (3) enter Security Code Number 1213, followed by the # sign. No cellular telephone use is permitted. All counsel shall have their calendars available so that the Court can pinpoint a special set trial date workable to all counsel and the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/17/2019. (jdo)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. section 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73.. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano (Weinshall, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). (Quintana, Marlene)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 1/22/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 1/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 7/8/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano (Attachments: #1 Case Management Deadline Worksheet)(Weinshall, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano (Weinshall, Matthew)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) identifying Corporate Parent Manulife Financial Corporation for John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) (Quintana, Marlene)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA) served on 3/29/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Weinshall, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Ashley Moore Drake. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Gabrielle Lisa Gould. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James O. Fleckner. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ashley Moore Drake. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gabrielle Gould. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James Fleckner. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Ashley Moore Drake. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Gabrielle Lisa Gould. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James O. Fleckner. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ashley M. Drake. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11573384 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gabrielle L. Gould. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11573374 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James O. Fleckner. Filing Fee $ 225.00 Receipt # 113C-11573331 by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Answer due 5/3/2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Attorney Marlene Quintana added to party John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA)(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quintana, Marlene)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). (mee)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA). Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11503046, filed by ERIC ROMANO, Todd Romano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Docket Sheet)(Weinshall, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMANO et al v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC ROMANO
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Boris L. Zhadanovskiy
Represented By: Christian D. Searcy
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Scarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Romano
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Boris L. Zhadanovskiy
Represented By: Christian D. Searcy
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: John Scarola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (USA)
Represented By: Ashley Moore Drake
Represented By: Gabrielle Lisa Gould
Represented By: James O. Fleckner
Represented By: Marlene Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?