Mazon v. FCA US LLC

Plaintiff: Abdelhamys Mazon
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv21247
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 7/11/2019. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Michael Roland Holt, Scott M. Sarason, Curtis Bradley Miner. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (isc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for July 10, 2019, at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC. (Sarason, Scott)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC for FCA US LLC (Sarason, Scott)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before May 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holt, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M. Sarason on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Scott M. Sarason added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft). (Sarason, Scott)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Roland Holt on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Michael Roland Holt added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft). (Holt, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Abdelhamys Mazon (Miner, Curtis)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (isc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (lh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11525797, filed by Abdelhamys Mazon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Miner, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazon v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelhamys Mazon
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Latoya Crystal Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?